sponsored links

###
**Addition Shortcuts : **

We can solve this problem in many ways.

- 37+30+8 = 75
- 37+3+35 = 75
- 37 + 40 - 2 = 75

###
**Subtraction Shortcuts :**

**Subtract 25 from 67**

Since 25 = 20 + 5 ,

67-25 = 67 - 20 - 5 = 42

###
**Multiplication Shortcuts :**

**Multiply 12 and 50**

12 x 50 = 12 x 5 x 10

= 60x10

**= 600**
(You can actually multiply by 5 and then add a zero to it)

**Note :**We all know that, to multiply a number by 10, 100 or 1000, we add zeroes at the end of the given number.

28x10 = 280

325x100 = 32500

4623 x 1000 = 4623000

So if you want to multiply 5 with any number, then just add a zero to it and divide it with 2.

28 x 5 = 280/2 = 140

**Multiply 569**x

**99**

We can use the same method explained above to solve this problem

as 99 = 100-1

569 x 99 = 569 x (100-1)

= 569 x 100 - 569 x 1

= 56900 - 569 = 56331

To multiply by 25, as 25 = (100/4), it is enough if we multiply the number by 100 and then divide the same by 4.

**Multiply 64 and 25**

We will consider 25 as 100/4 to solve this problem.

64 x 25 = 64x(100/4)

= 16x100 = 1600

**Multiply 64 and 50**

To multiply by 50, as 50 = 100/2,

it is enough if we multiply the number with 100 and then divide by 2.

64 x 50 = 64x (100/2) = (64/2) x 100 = 32x100 = 3200

Therefore, 64 x 50 = 3200

**Multiply 105 x 51**

We can take 51 as 50+1

so, 105 x 51

= 105 x (50+1)

= 105 x 50 + 105 x 1

= ((105 x 100)/2) + 105 = (10500/2_ + 105 = 5250 + 1058 = 5355

Therefore, 105 x 51 = 5355

**Multiply 64 x 125**

To multiply a number by 125, as 125 = 1000/8, we can multiply the number by 1000 and then divide by 8.

64 x 125 = 64 x 1000/8

= 64/8 x 1000 = 8x1000 = 8000

Therefore, 64x125 = 8000

**Multiply 648 x 127**

We can take 127 as 125+2

648x127 = 648x(125+2)

= 648x125 + 648x2

= 648 x (1000/8) + 648x2

= 8100 x 1296

= 82296

now let us move on to the problems of divisions.

###
**Division Shortcuts :**

**Note :**While performing division, sometimes, the divisor can be converted into a fraction of 10, 100 or 1000. But you must remember to change the numerator accordingly in order to keep the value unchanged.

**Divide 1500 % 500**

1500/500 = (1500x2) / (500x2)

= 3000/1000 = 3

**Simplify 350%50**

350/50 = (350x2) / (50x2) = 700/100 = 7

**Divide 420 % 20**

= 420/20 = (420x5)/(20/5)

= 2100/100 = 21

**That's all for now friends. You can check detailed shortcut techniques of math from here. Happy Reading.**

**Don't forget to LIKE our Facebook Page here to get daily updates**

thank you very much ..

ReplyDeletemultiply by 5 = multiply by 10 / divide by 2

ReplyDeletemultiply by 25 = multiply by 100 / divide by 4

569*99 simple trick when multiplying by 99,88,66 etc.

ReplyDelete569*9 unit place 9*9=8(1) carry 8 then 6+9=15*9 =135+8=14(3) carry 14 then 5+6=11*9=99+14=11(3) carry 11 then 5*9=45+11=(56)

answer will be 56331.

thank you

Thank u very much ...... It is so useful for bank exams.

Deleteplz send me other mental technics.

my email: jitendrahmr@gmail.com,,,

plz as soon as possible

Onther one tric for sqaure 40 to 60

ReplyDeletefirt squre of 50 = 2500 take as a prefrence now

you want 42 sqaure

50-42= 8

now 2500

- 8

_______

17

now ad in 8 squre 64

answer 1764

if above then 50 to do not minas but ad

54 squre 25+4 =29

2916

xclnt dr....Hatz off....

Deletethanq very much...

DeleteOnther one tric for sqaure 40 to 60

ReplyDeletefirt squre of 50 = 2500 take as a prefrence now

you want 42 sqaure

50-42= 8

now 2500

- 8

_______

17

now ad in 8 squre 64

answer 1764

if above then 50 to do not minas but ad

54 squre 25+4 =29

2916

We can remember easily 41 to 50 squares..

ReplyDeleteJst write 16 to 25 frm top to bottom nd again write squares of 0 to 9 from bottom to top.. Hope u al understd

41=1681

42=1764

43=1849

44=1936

45=2025

46=2116

47=2209

48=2304

49=2401

50=2500

thanq...its a simple technique...

Delete(42)2

ReplyDeleteFirst do square of 2 = 4

Den 4*2*2 = 16 so carry 1

Den square of 4 = 16 + 1- carry = 17

:1764

Its nothing but a²+2ab+b²

Square of 86=

a²=64 so 64

2ab = 2*8*6=96 96

b² = 36 36

So 7396