sponsored links

*vedic mathematics,*a student who knows simple addition and subtraction and the multiplication table up to five times of five (

**5x5=25)**can improvise all the necessary multiplication tables at any point of time and can himself do all the requisite multiplications even with a large numbers.

There are basically two methods of multiplication. Those are

**Nikhilam Method****Urdhva Tiryak Method**

In addition of these, there are certain shortcuts in some special cases. In this post we shall discuss some special cases. From our next post we shall discuss nikhilam method.

**Concept 1 :**

Product of two numbers

*in other words square of a number in which the digit in the***when the digits in the unit's place are 5's and the digits in the Ten's place are same,****unit's place**is**5 :****Examples :**

**1. Find 35 x 35**

**Solution :**

**Step 1 :**Here, in this case first we should multiply

**5**by

**5**

**5x5 = 25**

**Step 2 :**Observe that,

**3'**s are there in Tense place. We should increase one of the

**3'**s by

**1**then we get

**4,**we should multiply

**4**by

**3**then we get

**12.**So, the required answer is 1225

**2. Find 115x115**

**Solution :**

**Step 1 :**Here, in this case first we should multiply

**5**by

**5**

**5x5 = 25**

**Step 2 :**Observe that,

**11'**s are there in Tense place. We should increase one of the

**11'**s by

**1**then we get

**12,**we should multiply

**11**by

**12**

**Note :**Here we can get

**11x12**easily, as we know 11

^{2}is 121 and then we should add 11 to 121 then we get 132

so 115 x 115 = 13225

**Concept 2 :**

**a)**Product of two numbers when

**and**

*the sum of the digits in the unit's place is 10*

*the digits in the Ten's place and hundred's place are the same.***Example :**

**124 x 126 = 15624**

**Step 1 :**First by multiplying the digits in the

**Unit's place**we get

**24**

**Step 2 :**We should write the product of

**12 & 13**to the left of

**24**

**124 x 126 = 15624**

**(**we know that 12

^{2}

**is**

**144**and then we should add

**12**to

**144**to get

**12x13 = 156**)

**'It may be noted that the product of any two numbers irrespective of the number of digits satisfying the above condition can be found in the same way'.**

**b) Product of two big numbers satisfying the above condition**

**Example : 353 x 357**

**Step 1 :**First by multiplying the digits in the

**one's place**we get

**21**

**Step 2 :**We should write the product of

**35 & 36**to the left of 21

**353x357 = 126021**

**Note :**Here we can get

**35 x 36 = 1260**as we know 35

^{2}is

**1225**and then, we should add

**35**to

**1225**to get

**35 x 36 = 1260**

**Important Points to Note :**

**There are basically two methods of multiplication, Nikhilam Method & Urdhva Tiryak Method. In addition to these there are certain shortcuts in some specific cases.****When we have to find the square of a number with 5 in the unit's place we have to multiply 5 by 5 to get the right part of the answer. The left part of the answer can be obtained by multiplying the other part of the number with the next number.****When we have to find the product of two numbers with sum of the digits in unit's place 10, and when the digits in the other places are same, we have to multiply the digits in the unit's place to get the right side of the answer. To obtain the left side of the answer we have to multiply the other part of the number with the next number.**

**Now lets do some exercises (answers will be posted in tomorrow's lesson)**

- 65x65
- 85x85
- 95x95
- 75x75
- 55x55
- 125x125
- 135x135
- 145x145
- 165x165
- 105x105
- 175x175
- 155x155
- 253x257
- 354x356
- 459x451
- 652x658
- 857x853
- 959x951

**Answers to yesterday's Subtraction Exercises**

- 0146
- 0176
- 0226
- 0033
- 0327
- 3224
- 3226
- 0654
- 4944
- 4415

**About The Author***is a gold medalist from Osmania University (Hyderabad), one of the working members of*

**Rupali Shete (M.Sc., M.Phil., Ph.D)****Rananujan Mathematics Academy**and

**Institute of Scientific Research on Vedas (ISERVE)**, Currently working in

**University of Pune.**

sponsored links

hello sir/ mam

ReplyDeleteare you having any idea of number of students shortlisted for ibps po 3 interview??

near about 40-42 thousand

Deleteso it means a candidate who has scored a little low in online exam but able to score medium to high in the interview is having chances of getting job or no matter how the interview will go , he will get no job bcoz of less marks in online exam?

Deletehi sir

ReplyDeletei want to know the syllabus for ibps I.T specilist officer so plz let me know sir plz provide the info as soon as possible

answer for question no 8 . in subtraction for 6213 - 5469 is 744 mam not 654 for ques 8. please correct it.

ReplyDeleteqes 9 answer is also wrong mam here. its 4554 not 4944. i need to check my calculator for answers now. please correct it..

ReplyDelete43* 77 what is the Answer?

ReplyDelete