Search your Topic HERE....

December 29, 2011

Divisibility Rules

15 comments



  • A number is divisible by 2, when its unit digit is either Even or Zero.
  • A number is divisible by 3, wehen the sum of its digits is divisible by 3.
  • A number is divisible by 4, when the number formed by the two extreme right end digits is either divisible by 4 or both these digits are zeroes.
  • A number is divisible by 5, when its unit digit is either zero or 5.
  • A number is divisible by 6, when it is divisible bye 2 as well as 3.
  • A number is divisible is by 7, if it passes the following Test...
  • Take the last digit in a number.
  • Double and subtract the last digit in your number from the rest of the digits.
  • Repeat the process for larger numbers.
  • Take an Example 357 (Double the 7 to get 14. Subtract 14 from 35 to get 21 which is divisible by 7 and we can now say that 357 is divisible by 7.
  • A number is divisible by 8, when the number formed by its three extreme right end digits is divisible by 8 or when these last three digits are Zeros.
  • A number is divisible by 9, when the sum of its digits is divisible by 9.
  • A number is divisible by 10, when its unit digit is zero.
  • A number is divisible by 11, when the difference between the sums of the alternate digits is either zero or divisible by 11.
  • A number is divisible by 12, when it is divisible by 3 as well as 4.
  • A number is divisible by 13, if sum of 4 times the digit in units place and the number in the remaining part is multiple of 13.
  • If the difference of 5 times the digit in units place and the number in the remaining part is 0 or multiple of 17, then the number is divisible by 17.
  • If the sum of double the digit in units place of a given number and number in the remaining part is multiple of 19, then the given number is divisible of 19.
Liked this Post? Read more Shortcuts Here                                                                                                               
sponsored links

Read More...

December 28, 2011

Average

1 comment

  • Average of Given Items :

  • Average =Sum of the given Items
    Number of those Items


  • Average Speed :

    Suppose a Person covers a certain distance at X kmph and an equal distance at Ykmph.

    Then, the average speed for the whole journey will be (2XY)/(X+Y) Kmph

Read More...

December 24, 2011

All Nationalized Bank's list with their Websites

11 comments
Can anybody tell me when are the results of so n so bank is coming ?
Here are my mail id and Hall ticket number. Can anybody send me my results of so n so bank plzzzz. Trust me, nobody gonna take care to see your results and post that to you no matter how many zzzzzs you enclose at the end of your plzzzzz 

Here is the list of all Banks with their Website addresses. So all that you have to do is, just clicking on the bank name, and going to the site and checking in the careers section. Thats it :)

Click on the Bank Name for Details
➫ Reserve Bank of India
➫ Allahabad Bank
➫ Andhra Bank
➫ Bank of Baroda
➫ Bank of Maharashtra
➫ Canara Bank
➫ Central Bank of India
➫ Corporation Bank
➫ Dena Bank
➫ IBPS Common Exam Website
➫ Indian Bank 
➫ Indian Overseas Bank
➫ Oriental Bank of Commerce
➫ Punjab & Sind Bank
➫ Punjab National Bank
➫ Syndicate Bank
➫ UCO Bank
➫ Union Bank of India
➫ United Bank of Inida
➫ Vijaya Bank
➫ NABARD
➫ State Bank of India



Read More...

Some important points you should know about Decimals

11 comments
Some times, you have to  convert or express the given percentages in the form of decimals. It is not such a difficult task as we think. Have a look at the following.

1% = 1/100 = 0.01   (if two zeros are given, just move the decimal pointer two places left)
2% = 2/100 = 0.02 = 1/50 (the simplification of 2/100)
3% = 3/100 = 0.03 
4% = 4/100 = 0.04 = 1/25
5% = 5/100 = 0.05 = 1/20
6.25% = 6.25/100 = 0.0625 = 1/16 
7% = 7/100 = 0.07
7.5% = 7.5/100 = 0.075
10% = 10/100 = 0.1 = 1/10
12.5% = 12.5/100 = 0.125 = 1/8
20% = 0.2 = 1/5 
21% = 0.21
25% = 0.25 = 1/4
30% = 0.3 = 3/10
33.33% = 33.33/100 = 0.3333 = 1/3
37.5% = 0.375 = 3/8
40% = 0.4 = 2/5
50% = 0.5 = 1/2
60% = 0.6 = 3/5
62.5% = 0.625 = 5/8
66.66% = 66.66/100 = 2/3
75% = 0.75 = 3/4
80% = 0.8 = 4/5
87.5% = 0.875 = 7/8
100% = 1
125% = 1.25 = 1 1/4
150% = 1.5 = 1 1/2
200% = 2



sponsored links

Read More...

December 23, 2011

How to Prepare Reasoning for Bank Exams ?

2 comments
First of all lets have a look at the topics we should cover for the bank reasoning section.

Those are

  1. Verbal and
  2. Non Verbal

VERBAL
  • Number Series
  • Alphabet Series
  • Test of Direction Sense
  • Coding-Decoding
  • Number Ranking
  • Arithmetical Reasoning
  • Problem on Age Calculation
  • Blood Relations
  • Analogy
  • Decision Making etc.

NON-VERBAL


  • Non Verbal Series
  • Relationship with Other figures
  • Grouping Identical Figures
The Reasoning part of the exam has been designed to know how well can you think in stress situation. They will make you CONFUSE and asks about your girl friend's birth date. Now here the problem is not only remembering the girl friend's birth date, but also NOT to be confused when they asked you about that ;)  Ok jokes apart. 
There are some points  you should keep in mind while solving problems on Aptitude and Reasoning. They are
  • Not to be confused
  • Manage the Time
  • Skip the Difficult questions
  • Be patient while tackling with difficult paper
  • Dont be nervous
 Thats all friends.  All of us know these points , but the problem is with the Applicability. Ok now lets start preparing for the Reasoning. 

You can get Complete Shortcuts and Practice Problems of Reasoning for Bank Exams Here

How to Prepare Reasoning Questions for Bank Exams Bank Exams Reasoning Topics Shorts

Read More...

The structure of the English Paper

1 comment
English language section of Bank Exams contains Two Parts.


1. Objective
2. Descriptive


First of all We shall discuss about Objective type. In Objective type, They ask questions about
Functional Grammar :
         Again we can decide this Functional Grammar into several parts. Those are
                                              • Speech
                                              • Voice
                                              • Degrees
                                              • Sentences
                                              • Parts of Speech
                                              • Articles
                                              • Tenses
                                              • Phrases
                                              • Classes
                                              • Miscellaneous


 • Comprehension : Comprehend means "To Understand". Here they check your ability to understand the given passage (Its always good to read the given passage for 2 or 3 times before answering it).


Vocabulary : In this they will ask
                                                     • Wordpower
                                                     • Synonyms
                                                     • Antonyms


Jumbled Sentences : In this, they will  jumble 5 or 6 sentences of a paragraph. You should put them into the correct order.
• Fill in the Blanks : Here they will give you some sentences with blanks, and you should fill the blanks with appropriate words.


Sentence Completions : These are also similar to filling the blanks. But the difference is, here they give you half of the sentence and you should add the remaining sentence from the options


Friends, this is the basic structure of the English paper of Bank Exams. The most important rule while attending any English question in a competitive exam is that never look for the answer in the option, first read the question and have the strength to find its answers without looking into options after you get the answer check that in option and choose it. But if you go for option directly you will just get confused because examiner sets options in such a way that you feel all the options are correct this will drop your confidence and you will definitely opt for a wrong option. Hope this article helped you... Thats all for now friends... Have a Good Day. 

                                                                                               




If you like this post, please feel free to share this with your friends. Happy Reading
Read More...

December 22, 2011

Shortcuts in Division

27 comments
There are so many types of divisions are there. Lets have a look.

Division by parts --> Imagine you have Rs.874 . You have to give that to your two children.
874/2    [We can write this 874 as 800+74 (for our convenience)
= 800/2 + 74/2
= 400 + 37
= 437 

Division using the factors of the divisor: "this is also called as Double Division"

70/14
= (70/7)/2    (Because 7 and 2 are the factors of 14)
= 10/2
= 5

Division using Fractions:

132/2
= (100/2 + 32/2) ( here we've broken the given fraction into two separate fractions)
= (50 + 16)
= 66

Division by 5 :

Note: if you have to divide any number with 5, then divide it by 100 and then just multiply by 20
1400/5
= (1400/100) x 20
= 14 x 20
= 280

Division by 10 (Its very simple, just move the decimal point one place to the left)

0.5/10
= 0.05 

Division by 50 ( Just divide with 100 then multiply by 2)

2100/50
= (2100/100) x 2
= 21 x 2
= 42

700/50
= (700/100) x 2
= 7 x 2
= 14

Division by 100 (just move the decimal point two places to the left)

25/100 
= 0.25

Division by 500 (just divide with 100 and then multiply with 0.2)

17/500 
= (17/100) x 0.2 
= 0.17 x 0.2
= 0.034

Division by 25 (just divide by 100 and then multiply by 4 )

500/25
= (500/100) x 4
= 5 x 4
= 20

750/25
= (750/100) x 4
= 7.5 x 2 x 2
= 30

Liked this Post? Read more Here

sponsored links

Read More...

Shortcuts in Multiplications

81 comments
NOTE : These techniques are for Mental Maths. You should do calculations in your mind only. Please avoid using Pen/Pencil and Paper. 




Multiplication using multiples
Assume that we should find out the result of 12X15. 
12 x 15   (Here we can write this 15 as 5x3)
=  12 x 5 x 3 (now 12x5 becomes 60)
=  60 x 3 (For this you just calculate 3x6, that is 18 and add one Zero to it. that is 180)
=  180 (see, how simple it is?)



Multiplication by distribution 

Assume that we should find out the result of 12x17
12 x 17   (Here we can divide this 17 as 10+7. here, multiplying 12 with 17 is same as multiplying 12 with 10 and 7 separately and then adding the results)
so, we can write it as
= (12 x 10) + (12 x 7) 
= 120 + 84
= 204 



Multiplication by "giving and taking"
12 x 47  (Here its little difficult for us to calculate the multiplication of 12 and 47 mentally. so just check for the ROUNDED number nearer to 47. Yes it is 50. so.....

= 12 x (50 - 3) 
= (12 x 50) - (12 x 3)  (we have discussed this rule earlier)
= 600 - 36
= 564



Multiplication by 5

* If we have to multiply a number with 5, just divide the number with 2 and then multiply the result with 10. Confused? Its very simple step actually....
428 x 5   (Now just divide the number with 2)
= 428 x 1/2 = 214 (Now multiply it with 10. I mean just add a zero at the end :P)
= 214 x 10
= 2140 (This is our result)

Whats the logic behind this step? 
Very simple. 
* Lets say the number is X. 
* Now we are dividing the number with 2.  so here X becomes X/2. 
* And then we are multiplying it with 10.  So it will become 10x / 2  
* Now cancel it with 2. so it becomes 10x / 2 = 5X = 5 multiplied by X. Thats it ;)



Multiplication by 10  ------------  just move the decimal point one place to the right
16 x 10
= 160
15.9 = 159
169.93 = 1699.3   (Need an explnation for this too??? :P)

Multiplication by 50 ------ divide with 2 and then multiply by 100
Well, this is also same process as we did for 5. Here we should add an extra zero. Thats it
18 x 50
= (18/2)  = 9
= 9 x 100
= 900



Multiplication by 100 -------- move the decimal point two places to the right
45 x 100
= 4500  



Multiplication by 500-------- divide with two and multiply with 1000 
21 x 500
= 21/2 x 1000
= 10.5 x 1000
= 10500



Multiplication by 25 ---------- use the analogy Rs 1 = 4 x 25 Paise
25 x 14 (just divide the 14 as 10+4)
= (25 x 10) + (25 x 4) 
= 250 + 100 --->  Rs2.50 + Rs1
= 350


Hey one more thing. Here you can use another technique too. Which we have used for multiplication with 5.

Multiplication by 25 -----------  Divide by 4 and multiply by 100 

36 x 25
= (36/4) x 100
= 9 x 100
= 900  
Multiplication by 11 (if sum of digits is less than 10)
72 x 11
= 7+2 =9, it is Less than 10. so,
= place this term 9 between 7 &2

= 792 (That's the answer)



Multiplication by 11 (if sum of digits is greater than 10)
87 x 11
=>  8 + 7 = 15 
because here 15 is greater than 10, first use 5 and then add 1 to the first term 8, 
which gives you the answer
= 957 

Multiplication of numbers ending in 5 with the same first terms (square of a number)
25 x 25 
first term = (2 + 1) x 2 = 6
last term = 25
answer = 625 ---> square of 25

75 x 75 
first term = (7 + 1) x 7 = 56
last term = 25
answer = 5625 ---> 75 squared


Liked this Post? Read more Shortcuts Here >>

sponsored links

Read More...