Search your Topic HERE....

March 27, 2014

Vedic Maths Shortcut Techniques for Multiplication - Lesson 4

17 comments

sponsored links

Friends, here is the 4th lesson of our Vedic Math Multiplication shortcut techniques series (you can read remaining lessons from here). This method is called as "Eka Nyunena Purvena". That means "By one less than the previous one". This method works if one of the given numbers consists of all 9s. Lets try to understand this method with an example.

Example 1 : 68 x 99 = ?


Method 1 :
  • Put four blanks in the result
Step 1 :
  1. The number preceding 99 = 68
  2. Complement of 68 = 32
  3. Put this complement in the two blanks on RHS of the result
Present Status :








Step 2 :
  1. The number preceding 99 = 68
  2. A number that is less by 1 than the given number = 68-1 = 67
  3. Put this 67 in the two blanks on LHS of the result







So 68 x 99 = 6732

Method 2 : 99 x 68 = ?
  1. One of the given numbers is 99. It is having all 9s
  2. The second number can be anything.
  3. Put both the numbers as shown above.
  4. Put 4 blanks for the result.
  5. Reduce the second number by 1. It becomes 67 (68-1). Put this 67 exactly below the number 99 as shown below.
  6. Subtract the digit 6 from the 9 above. 9-6 = 3
  7. Put this 3 in the blank that belongs to 1.'s place of the result
    • Present Status : 
  8. Subtract the digit 7 from the 9 above. 9 - 7 = 2
  9. Put this 2 in the blank that belongs to units place of the result
Result = 99x68 = 6732

Lets see another example.

Example 2 : 53 x 99 = ?


We shall solve this using the method 1.

Step 1 : 
  1. The number preceding 99 = 53
  2. Complement of 53 = 47
  3. Put this complement in the two blanks on RHS of the result
Step 2 :
  1. The number preceding 99 = 53
  2. A number that is less by 1 than the given number is = 53-1 = 52
  3. Put this 52 in the two blanks on LHS of the result
So, the answer is 53 x 99 = 5247
Note : There are two 9s' in the multiplier 99 in the given examples. Other number that is being multiplied is also of two digits. Hence the result may be of maximum of four digits. Hence we use four blanks for the result.

If the numbers are of three digits each, and one of them is 999, then we have to have 6 blanks for the result.

Example 3 : 123 x 999 = ?


Step 1 :
  1. The number preceding 999 = 123
  2. Complement of 123 = 877
  3. Put this complement in the three blanks on RHS of the result
Step 2 :
  1. The number preceding 999 = 123
  2. A number that is less by 1 than the given number = 123-1 = 122
  3. Put this 122 in the three blanks on LHS of the result

Example 4 : 15064 x 99999 = ?

Step 1 :
  1. The number preceding 99999 = 15064
  2. Complement of 15064 = 84936
  3. Put this complement in the five blanks on RHS of the result
Step 2 :
  1. The number preceding 99999 = 15064
  2. A number that is less by 1 thank the given number = 15064-1 = 15063
  3. Put this 15063 in the five blanks on LHS of the result.
15063 | 84936
So, 15064 x 99999 = 1506384936

Method 2 : 99999 x 15064 = ?
  1. One of the given numbers is 99999. It is having all 9's
  2. The second number can be anything.
  3. Put both the numbers as shown above.
  4. Put ten blanks for the result
  5. Reduce the second number by 1. It becomes 15063 (15064-1). Put this 15063 exactly below the number 99999 as shown below.
  6. Subtract each digit of 15063 from 99999
    • 9-1 = 8
    • 9-5 = 4
    • 9-0 = 9
    • 9-6 = 3
    • 9-3 = 6
Put these digits in the remaining blanks (RHS of the result) from left to right

Result : 99999 x 15064 = 1506384936 

That's all for now friends. In our next post we shall discuss another useful method of Vedic Maths. Happy Reading :)


About The Author                                             

Rupali Shete (M.Sc., M.Phil., Ph.D) is a gold medalist from Osmania University (Hyderabad), one of the working members of Rananujan Mathematics Academy and Institute of Scientific Research on Vedas (ISERVE), Currently working in University of Pune.



sponsored links

17 comments:

  1. Welcome back Rulapali madam. I am your fan. Your posts are really very helpful. Please post regularly. Thank you.

    ReplyDelete
  2. valid only for same number of digits on both parts.....if the number of digits are not equal result will be different

    ReplyDelete
    Replies
    1. Ofcourse, I clearly mentioned that in the post itself. There are various techniques for multiplication if the numbers are completely different. you will get them soon..

      Delete
  3. Thank you so much! You guys are great!!

    ReplyDelete
  4. Hello Rupali Madam,

    This post is very useful for me
    but how to calculate complement of number ?

    can u explain with example
    thank you in advance

    ReplyDelete
  5. Hello Madam

    how to calculate complement of number
    can u explain with example

    ReplyDelete
    Replies
    1. I'll post a detailed procedure about Finding Complements by tomorrow Amol.

      Delete
  6. Awesome..good job sir.
    I expect more from you .
    Please continuously apply more short cut tricks...

    ReplyDelete
  7. Friends you need to subtract d given numbers n add 1 to that, u will get d complement no.

    ReplyDelete
  8. Thank u mam for ur wonderful effort

    ReplyDelete
  9. every thing is gud.......... bt sir I cant understand the complement number.. can u explain that alone........

    ReplyDelete
  10. thank you,very useful.explain about complement

    ReplyDelete
  11. thank you.i need detailed notes of complement.

    ReplyDelete
  12. Ye to sise ho jayega 99999 ko 100000 man lo aur ab 15064 she multiple yoga 1506400000-15064=1506384936

    ReplyDelete
  13. mam what will do if 68 multiply 999
    how many blank position we take

    ReplyDelete

Related Posts Plugin for WordPress, Blogger...